EP1076382 - Mezzanine style electrical connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERG ELECTRONICS MANUFACTURING B.V. Helftheuvelweg 11 5202 CB'S-Hertogenbosch / NL | [2001/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harper, Donald K. 414 NORTH 48TH STREET Harrisburg PA 17111 / US | 02 /
Forman, Steven K. 2302 Scarsborough Drive Harrisburg PA 17112 / US | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116260.1 | 08.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | US19990147807P | 09.08.1999 Original published format: US 147807 P | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1076382 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1076382 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/24, H01R12/22 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
H01R13/2435 (EP,US);
H01R12/714 (EP,US);
H01R12/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/05] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zwischenbodenartiger elektrischer Verbinder | [2001/07] | English: | Mezzanine style electrical connector | [2001/07] | French: | Connecteur électrique de type mezzanine | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 10.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 02.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/36] | 02.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.12.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 19.12.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5462440 (ROTHENBERGER RICHARD E [US]) [DA] 1-3,7,8,11,12 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 17; figures 1,2,6 *; | [A]EP0849842 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,8,11,12 * column 2, line 18 - line 43 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 16 *; | [A]US5228861 (GRABBE DIMITRY G [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 4; figures 1,11 * |