EP1083250 - Round comb clothing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graf + Cie AG 8640 Rapperswil / CH | For:CH
DE
IT
LI
MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 8406 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states GRAF + CIE AG 8640 Rapperswil / CH | ||
For:CH
DE
IT
LI
MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | |||
Former [2002/04] | For:AT
BE
CY
DK
ES
FI
FR
GB
IE
LU
MC
NL
PT
SE
GRAF + CIE AG 8640 Rapperswil / CH | ||
For:CH
DE
IT
LI
MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Postfach 290 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | |||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states GRAF + CIE AG 8640 Rapperswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Ralph A. Strandweg 4 8807 Freienbach / CH | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/11] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116326.0 | 27.07.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | DE19991036049 | 30.07.1999 Original published format: DE 19936049 | [2001/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083250 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083250 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083250 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D01G19/10 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
D01G15/88 (EP,US);
D01G19/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | Rundkamm-Garnitur | [2001/11] | English: | Round comb clothing | [2001/11] | French: | Garniture d'un peigne circulaire | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/48] | 26.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | FR | 28.01.2004 | GB | 28.01.2004 | IE | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | ES | 09.05.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | AT | 27.07.2004 | LU | 27.07.2004 | BE | 31.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | CY | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
AT | 27.07.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
FR | 28.01.2004 | ||
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
AT | 27.07.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
AT | 27.07.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
BE | 31.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
LU | 27.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/03] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
IE | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GB | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19649808 (MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 1; figure 1; claim 1 * [A] 13-15; | [A]EP0179158 (STAEDTLER & UHL [DE]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 5, line 8 - page 8, line 9; figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0382899 (STAEDTLER & UHL [DE]) [A] 1,2,6,13-15 * column 3, line 2 - column 4, line 50; figures 6,7; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE4326205 (GRAF & CO AG [CH]) |