EP1176423 - Surface-attached polyfunctional polymer networks for sensor chips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micronas Holding GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [2004/14] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states BioChip Technologies GmbH Engesserstrasse 4b 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rühe, Jürgen Im Längental 15 79653 Eichstetten / DE | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Stürken, Joachim Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Kirchenhölzle 18 79104 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/14] | Stürken, Joachim Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engesserstrasse 4 a 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | Teipel, Susanne, Dr. Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/05] | Stürken, Joachim Joachim Stürken Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engesserstrasse 4 b 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116340.1 | 27.07.2000 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176423 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176423 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, C12Q1/68 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
C07H21/00 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (US);
B01J20/291 (US);
B01J20/3204 (US);
B01J20/3208 (US);
B01J20/3219 (US);
B01J20/327 (US);
B01J20/3272 (US);
B01J20/3278 (US);
B01J20/3282 (US);
G01N33/5436 (EP,US);
G01N33/54393 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00497 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00659 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00722 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00725 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00729 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00731 (EP,US);
B01J2220/54 (US);
C07B2200/11 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C40B40/06 (EP,US);
C40B40/10 (EP,US);
C40B40/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/05] | Title | German: | Auf einer Oberfläche befestigte multifunktionelle Polymere-Netzwerke für Sensorchips | [2002/05] | English: | Surface-attached polyfunctional polymer networks for sensor chips | [2002/05] | French: | Réseaux polymères fixés à des surfaces pour des puces-capteurs | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2001 | Examination requested [2002/05] | 14.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.08.2006 | 08.08.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 25.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2004 | 31.07.2005 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.02.2007 | BE | 28.02.2007 | CY | 28.02.2007 | DK | 28.02.2007 | FI | 28.02.2007 | GR | 29.05.2007 | SE | 31.05.2007 | ES | 08.06.2007 | IE | 27.07.2007 | LU | 27.07.2007 | PT | 30.07.2007 | MC | 31.07.2007 | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
CY | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.07.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/19] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
GR | 29.05.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
BE | 28.02.2007 | ||
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
PT | 30.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT | 28.02.2007 | |
DK | 28.02.2007 | ||
FI | 28.02.2007 | ||
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 28.02.2007 | |
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
ES | 08.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 28.02.2007 | |
SE | 31.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/36] | FI | 28.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4352884 (NAKASHIMA TOSHIHIDE, et al) [X] 1-10,17-20 * examples 1-5 * [Y] 1,11-15; | [X]US5026785 (MAGE MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-10,17-20 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2682609 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) [X] 1,17-20 * examples 2-5,8-10 *; | [XY]US5478893 (GHOSH SOUMITRA S [US], et al) [X] 1-10,16-23 * the whole document * [Y] 1,11-15; | [XY]US5695925 (EBERSOLE RICHARD CALVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-10,17-22 * column 9, line 51 - column 13, line 47 * * column 21, line 57 - column 25, line 47; example 9 * [Y] 1,11-15; | [X]WO9832790 (FLOWGENIX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-15,23,24 * page 31, line 22 - page 32, line 3; figures 6-11,13 *; | [E]WO0043539 (BIOCHIP TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [DY] - O PRUCKER, J RÜHE, "Polymer Layers through Self-Assembled Monolayers of Initiators", LANGMUIR, (1998), vol. 14, no. 24, pages 6893 - 6898, XP002157970 [DY] 1,11-15 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/la971035o | [DY] - O PRUCKER, J RÜHE, "Synthesis of Poly(styrene) Monolayers Attached to High Surface Area Silica Gels through Self-Assembled Monolayers of Azo Initiators", MACROMOLECULES, (1998), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 592 - 601, XP002157971 [DY] 1,11-15 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma970660x | [DA] - O PRUCKER, J RÜHE, "Mechanism of Radical Chain Polymerizations Initiated by Azo Compounds Covalently Bound to the Surface of Spherical Particles", MACROMOLECULES, (1998), vol. 31, no. 3, pages 602 - 613, XP002157972 [DA] 1,11-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma970661p |