blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1076031

EP1076031 - Protection device for a moving walk way or for an escalator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.02.2006
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.02.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.04.2006  [2006/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inventio AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2005/16]For all designated states
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil NW / CH
Former [2001/07]For all designated states
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
CH-6052 Hergiswil NW / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Illedits, Thomas, Ing.
Anton-Proksch-Gasse 7
2491 Neufeld / AT
02 / Pallinger, Reinhard, Ing.
Brünnerstrasse 51/20
1210 Wien / AT
 [2001/07]
Application number, filing date00116498.731.07.2000
[2001/07]
Priority number, dateEP1999081071609.08.1999         Original published format: EP 99810716
[2001/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1076031
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1076031
Date:20.04.2005
Language:DE
[2005/16]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2000
ClassificationIPC:B66B31/00
[2001/07]
CPC:
B66B31/006 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2002/01]
Former [2001/44]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  LI 
Former [2001/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Schutzvorrichtung für einen Fahrsteig oder eine Fahrtreppe[2001/07]
English:Protection device for a moving walk way or for an escalator[2001/07]
French:Dispositif de protection pour un tapis roulant ou pour un escalier roulant[2001/07]
Examination procedure18.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
15.08.2001Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
14.11.2003Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
27.09.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2005Fee for grant paid
20.01.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
02.09.2003BE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003CY   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003DK   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003ES   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003FI   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003GR   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003IE   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003IT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003LU   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003MC   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003NL   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003PT   M01   Not yet paid
02.09.2003SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9720760  (SANTORO ANTONINO [IT]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1,8 * [Y] 2,3;
 [Y]US5706929  (EASTON RICHARD L [US]) [Y] 2,3 * column 3, line 4 - line 41; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE1756205  (MASCH FABRIEK BREDA V H BACKER) [A] 1-8 * page 8, paragraph 3; figures 3,5 *;
 [A]DE1246563  (INVENTIO AG) [A] 1-8 * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB1043634  (INVENTIO AG) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.