EP1074574 - Condensation reaction curable silsesquioxane resin composition and methods for the synthesis and cure thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/06] | Condensation reaction curable silesquioxane resin composition and methods for the synthesis and cure thereof | ||
[2004/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsoulis, Dimitris Elias 2201 Wilmington Drive Midland, Michigan 48640 / US | 02 /
Zhu, Bizhong 1815 Eastlawn Drive Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116648.7 | 02.08.2000 | [2001/06] | Priority number, date | US19990369413 | 06.08.1999 Original published format: US 369413 | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1074574 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1074574 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/48, C09D183/14, C08L83/14 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
C08G77/50 (EP,US);
C08G77/52 (EP,US);
C09D183/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/43] |
Former [2001/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Durch Kondensationsreaktion vernetzbare Silsesquioxanharzzusammensetzung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und Vernetzung | [2001/06] | English: | Condensation reaction curable silsesquioxane resin composition and methods for the synthesis and cure thereof | [2004/25] | French: | Composition d'une résine silsesquioxane réticulable par réaction condensation et procédés de sa préparation et reticulation | [2001/06] |
Former [2001/06] | Condensation reaction curable silesquioxane resin composition and methods for the synthesis and cure thereof | Examination procedure | 29.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 11.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.11.2004 | NL | 17.11.2004 | [2007/35] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5747608 (KATSOULIS DIMITRIS ELIAS [US], et al) [DA] 1-15 * page 2, line 1 - line 5 * * column 4, line 46 - line 58 * * column 5, line 15 - line 26 * * column 6, line 46 - line 61 * * column 7, line 11 * * column 7, line 56 - line 59 * * column 8, line 27 - line 38 * * column 8, line 53 - line 60 * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0304958 (TORAY SILICONE CO [JP]) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 1 - line 4 * * page 2, line 17 - line 48 * * page 5, line 6 - line 9 * * page 5, line 43 - line 49 * * example 1 *; | [A]US4965333 (INOUYE YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 7, line 2 - line 6 * * example - *; | [A] - HCA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, XP002153341 [A] 1,2,5,10,12 * abstract * | [ ] - D. A. LOY ET AL., "Alkylene-bridged polysilsesquioxane aerogels: highly porous hybrid organic-inorganic materials", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS., NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM., NL, (1995), no. 186, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 44 - -53 |