EP1085565 - Semiconductor device having sealing film formed on the surface having columnar electrodes thereon and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2007 [2007/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osamu, Kuwabara 1-33-9, Minamiogikubo, Suginami-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00116963.0 | 07.08.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | JP19990260614 | 14.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26061499 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085565 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085565 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H01L21/56 (EP,US);
H01L23/492 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2002/13] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Halbleiterbauelement mit einer Abdichtfolie, die über der Oberfläche mit darüberliegenden säulenförmigen Elektroden hergestellt wird, und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [2001/12] | English: | Semiconductor device having sealing film formed on the surface having columnar electrodes thereon and method of manufacturing the same | [2001/12] | French: | Dispositif à semiconducteur avec un film d'étanchéité formé sur la surface sur laquelle on trouve des électrodes en forme de colonne, et son procédé de fabrication | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 26.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/10] | 17.10.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH07183425 ; | [YA]JPH05129373 ; | [Y]JPH04346235 ; | [PX]JP2000208535 ; | [A]US5232651 (OKUNO ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3,10-12,19 * figure 9A * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 61 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 30 *; | [XA]US5650667 (LIOU SHIANN-MING [US]) [X] 1,2,9 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 49 - line 67 * * column 3, line 19 - line 56 * [A] 10,30,32; | [XA]US5908317 (HEO YOUNGWOOK [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,9,32-35 * figures 1-3,6 * * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 7 * [A] 3,5-8,10-31; | [PX]EP0993040 (JAPAN REC CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4,6-10,13-19,22,32-34 * figures 1-13 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0042] *; | [E]EP1085564 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-35 * figures 1-12 ** paragraphs [0010] - [0026] * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951130), vol. 1995, no. 10, & JP07183425 A 19950721 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,4,6-8,17,31-35 * abstract * [A] 3,5,9,11,12,14 [Y] 10,13,15,16,19-28 | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930909), vol. 017, no. 501, Database accession no. (E - 1429), & JP05129373 A 19930525 (NEC CORP) [Y] 10,13,15,16 * abstract * [A] 1-7,11,12,14,26,30-35 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930421), vol. 017, no. 203, Database accession no. (E - 1354), & JP04346235 A 19921202 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 19-28 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001117), vol. 2000, no. 10, & JP2000208535 A 20000728 (SHINKO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1,4,6,7,10,13,15,16,19,32-35 * abstract * |