EP1087561 - Device for extracting and inserting optical carriers in optical communications networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies Fiber IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. No. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2006/52] |
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. (a Delaware corporation) 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies Inc. a Delaware Corporation 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc., a corporation of the State of Delaware 395 Page Mill Road, P.O.Box 10395 Palo Alto, CA 94303-0870 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bendelli, Giampaolo Via Castelletto, 11/1 10040 Almese (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Gastaldi, Luigi Via Gerbidi, 41 10070 Fiano Torinese (Torino) / IT | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nußbaumstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/13] | Bosotti, Luciano, et al Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Fiume 6 10133 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 00117001.8 | 08.08.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | IT1999TO00816 | 23.09.1999 Original published format: IT TO990816 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087561 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1087561 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, G02B6/34, H04B10/213 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04J14/0212 (US);
H04J14/0213 (EP,US);
H04J14/0219 (EP,US);
H04J14/0291 (EP,US);
G02B6/2932 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/10] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entnahme und Einfügen optischer Träger in optischen Nachrichtenübertragungsnetzwerken | [2001/13] | English: | Device for extracting and inserting optical carriers in optical communications networks | [2001/13] | French: | Dispositif d'extraction et d'insertion de porteuses optiques dans de résaux de communication optique | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 17.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 28.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.01.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0638837 (CSELT CENTRO STUDI LAB TELECOM [IT]); |