EP1075912 - Motorized hand tool with at least one hollow shaped hand grip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolmar GmbH Jenfelder Strasse 38 22045 Hamburg / DE | [2001/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegs, Carsten Hermann-Balk-Strasse 89 22147 Hamburg / DE | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Gerbaulet, Hannes RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Gerbaulet, Hannes Patentanwälte Richter, Werdermann & Gerbaulet Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117147.9 | 10.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | DE1999214164U | 12.08.1999 Original published format: DE 29914164 U | [2001/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1075912 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1075912 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | [2004/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075912 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B27B17/00 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
F02B63/02 (EP,US);
B27B17/0008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, IT, SE [2004/43] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Motorbetriebenes Handwerkzeug mit wenigstens einem hohl ausgebildeten Handgriff | [2001/07] | English: | Motorized hand tool with at least one hollow shaped hand grip | [2001/07] | French: | Outil à main motorisé à au moins une poignée creuse | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 19.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.07.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.11.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.09.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.09.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE7322585U (ANDREAS STIHL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2843164 (MARSH JAMES H) [A] 1 * column 2, line 12 - line 22 * * figure - *; | [A]DE7020398U (PARTNER AB [SE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 6, line 7 * * figure - *; | [A]DE1628927 (ZUENDAPP WERKE GMBH) [A] 1 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 27 * * figures 1,10B *; | [A]US4236310 (MUELLER ERICH) [A] 1 * column 9, line 39 - line 60 * * column 14, line 21 - line 34 *; | [A]US5345684 (SHOUP MICHAEL W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 47 - line 61 ** figure - * |