EP1079454 - Flat non-aqueous electrolyte secondary cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Energy, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki-cho, Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | [2011/32] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell, Ltd. 1-1-88 Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | ||
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Toshiba Battery Co., Ltd. 4-10, Minamishinagawa 3-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Masami 816 Daikoku-sou 202 Ogura Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayami, Muneto, @242-2 Toshiba-denti Fujitsuka-ryou A102 Fujitsuka-chou Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370-0875 / JP | 03 /
Udagawa, Kazuo 10-27 Shakujiidai 3-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 177-0045 / JP | 04 /
Iiduka, Kazuo 9-13 Kataoka-machi 2-chome Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370-0862 / JP | 05 /
Ishihara, Naomi 2354-3 Haraichi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-0133 / JP | 06 /
Hirahara, Satoshi 17-10 Annaka 3-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-0116 / JP | 07 /
Sakai, Hirotaka 147-2A-bani-haimu Isobe 110 Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma-ken 379-0224 / JP | 08 /
Yoda, Kiyoto, @3-47 Sunrise-Shinjou 103 Shinsaku 6-chome Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0014 / JP | 09 /
Shikota, Masataka, @565-6 HartFord 201 Nagaodai-cho Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0843 / JP | [2017/29] |
Former [2001/09] | 01 /
Suzuki, Masami 816 Daikoku-sou 202, Ogura, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Hayami, Muneto, 242-2 Toshiba-denti Fujitsuka-ryou A102, Fujitsuka-chou Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370-0875 / JP | |||
03 /
Udagawa, Kazuo 10-27 Shakujiidai 3-chome, Nerima-ku Tokyo 177-0045 / JP | |||
04 /
Iiduka, Kazuo 9-13 Kataoka-machi 2-chome Takasaki-shi, Gunma-ken 370-0862 / JP | |||
05 /
Ishihara, Naomi 2354-3 Haraichi Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-0133 / JP | |||
06 /
Hirahara, Satoshi 17-10 Annaka 3-chome Annaka-shi, Gunma-ken 379-0116 / JP | |||
07 /
Sakai, Hirotaka 147-2A-bani-haimu Isobe 110, Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun, Gunma-ken 379-0224 / JP | |||
08 /
Yoda, Kiyoto, 3-47 Sunrise-Shinjou 103 Shinsaku 6-chome, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 213-0014 / JP | |||
09 /
Shikota, Masataka, 565-6 HartFord 201 Nagaodai-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken 244-0843 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2017/29] |
Former [2001/09] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117368.1 | 23.08.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | JP19990240964 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24096499 | JP19990241290 | 27.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24129099 | JP19990327679 | 18.11.1999 Original published format: JP 32767999 | JP20000183000 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000183000 | JP20000183001 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000183001 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1079454 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1079454 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | [2006/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079454 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M10/04 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H01M10/0583 (EP,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0427 (EP,US);
H01M10/0431 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M50/109 (EP,US);
H01M50/119 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/133 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/3425 (EP,US);
H01M50/545 (EP,US);
H01M6/103 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2006/106 (EP,US);
H01M4/13 (EP,US);
H01M4/669 (EP,US);
H01M6/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/09] | H01M10/40, H01M2/02, H01M10/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/29] |
Former [2007/18] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flache Sekundärzelle mit nichtwässrigen Elektrolyten | [2001/09] | English: | Flat non-aqueous electrolyte secondary cell | [2001/09] | French: | Pile plate rechargeable à électrolyte nonaqueux | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2001/09] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 19.09.2017 | GB | 19.10.2017 | [2018/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2000164259 ; | [X]US2971999 (JACQUIER PIERRE A C) [X] 1,2,4 * figures 1-4,7 * * column 2, line 56 - column 6, line 54 *; | [X]US4356240 (DEY ARABINDA N, et al) [X] 53-59,61,65* the whole document *; | [X]US4830940 (KEISTER PAMELA P [US], et al) [X] 36-39,41,42,53,54,56-58,61 * figures 1,10,23-27 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 9 * * column 9, paragraph 2 * * column 16, line 3 - column 17, line 60 *; | [PX]EP1011163 (VARTA GERAETEBATTERIE GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1,2,4,13,15,16 * figures 1,3; claim 9 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0010] , [0013] , [0015] - [0026] * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000164259 A 20000616 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-4,7,18-22,25 * abstract * |