EP1076284 - Method and apparatus for implementing arithmetical operations in finite fields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Change - representative | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Certicom Corp. 5520 Explorer Drive 4th Floor Mississauga, ON L4W 5L1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Certicom Corp. 5520 Explorer Drive, 4th Floor Mississauga, Ontario L4W 5L1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lambert, Robert J. 63 Holm Street Cambridge, Ontario N3C 3N3 / CA | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | ||
Former [2001/07] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter, Dr. Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117427.5 | 11.08.2000 | [2001/07] | Priority number, date | CA19992280271 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: CA 2280271 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076284 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/72 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
G06F7/724 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2001/44] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Implementieren von arithmetischen Operationen in endlichen Feldern | [2001/07] | English: | Method and apparatus for implementing arithmetical operations in finite fields | [2001/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'implémentation d'opérations arithmétiques dans des corps finis | [2001/07] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 23.10.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/42] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ANWARUL HASAN M ET AL, "MODULAR CONSTRUCTION OF LOW COMPLEXITY PARALLEL MULTIPLIERS FOR A CLASS OF FINITE FIELDS GF(2M)", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTERS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19920801), vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0018-9340, pages 962 - 971, XP000298590 [A] 1 * page 963, column L, line L - column R; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/12.156539 | [XP] - HUAPENG WU ET AL, "Highly regular architectures for finite field computation using redundant basis", PROCEEDINGS (LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE VOLUME 1717), CRYPTOGRAPHIC HARDWARE AND EMBEDDED SYSTEMS. FIRST INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP, CHES'99, WORCESTER, MA, USA, 1, 1999, Berlin, Germany, Springer-Verlag, Germany, ISBN 3-540-66646-X, pages 269 - 279, XP000964777 [XP] 1 * the whole document * |