EP1077495 - Process and device for manufacturing an electro-optic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / SG / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / SG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reifel, Dirk Bussardweg 6 76297 Stutensee / DE | [2001/08] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/08] | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00117637.9 | 16.08.2000 | [2001/08] | Priority number, date | DE1999139364 | 19.08.1999 Original published format: DE 19939364 | [2001/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1077495 | Date: | 21.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1077495 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01R13/66, H01R13/627, G02B6/42, B29C39/10, B29C33/00, B29C39/26 | [2003/33] | CPC: |
H01R13/6271 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/08] | H01L33/00, H01R13/66, H01R13/627 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/19] |
Former [2001/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines elektrooptischen Bauteils | [2001/08] | English: | Process and device for manufacturing an electro-optic device | [2001/08] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la fabrication d'un dispositif électro-optique | [2001/08] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/48] | 15.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.03.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH11119064 ; | [PX]JP2000110176 ; | [A]DE19711138 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 29 - line 47; figure 2 *; | [PXA]US5960141 (SASAKI SEIMI [JP], et al) [PX] 5,10 * column 8, line 46 - column 9, line 23; figures 11-14 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 23; figures 17-21 * [PA] 8; | [LE]WO0065394 (TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG [CH], et al) [LE] 1,3,5,7,10 * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 3; figures 6-8; claim 14 *; | [E]US6170996 (MIURA KAZUNORI [JP], et al) [E] 1,3-5,7,10 * column 8, line 10 - column 9, line 13; figures 24,25A-25C; claims 15-21 * * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 16 * * column 6, lines 13-15; figure 4B * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11119064 A 19990430 (FUJITSU LTD) [X] 5,10 * abstract * [A] 8 | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000110176 A 20000418 (FUJITSU LTD) [PX] 1,3-5,7,10 * abstract * |