EP1080695 - Medical treatment apparatus for supporting or controlling medical treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/10] | Medical treatment apparatus and method for supporting or controlling medical treatment | ||
[2011/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | ||
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6 Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tajima, Fujio, @Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Fujie, Masakatsu, @Hitachi, Ltd.Intell. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Takeuchi, Hiroshi, @Hitachi, Ltd.Intell.Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Etsuji, @Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Sano, Koichi, @Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 06 /
Kan, Kazutoshi, @Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2011/43] |
Former [2001/10] | 01 /
Tajima, Fujio, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujie, Masakatsu, Hitachi, Ltd.Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
03 /
Takeuchi, Hiroshi, Hitachi, Ltd.Intell.Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamamoto, Etsuji, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell.Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
05 /
Sano, Koichi, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | |||
06 /
Kan, Kazutoshi, Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg., 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/10] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118208.8 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | JP19990244796 | 31.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24479699 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1080695 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1080695 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61B17/00 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
A61B8/565 (EP,US);
A61B34/70 (EP,US);
A61B17/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/02 (EP,US);
A61B17/0281 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Medizinisches Behandlungsgerät zur Unterstützung oder Steuerung medizinischer Behandlungen | [2011/18] | English: | Medical treatment apparatus for supporting or controlling medical treatment | [2011/18] | French: | Appareil de traitement médical pour le soutien ou la commande de traitement médical | [2011/18] |
Former [2001/10] | Medizinisches Behandlungsgerät und Verfahren zur Unterstützung oder Steuerung medizinischer Behandlungen | ||
Former [2001/10] | Medical treatment apparatus and method for supporting or controlling medical treatment | ||
Former [2001/10] | Appareil et méthode de traitement médical pour le soutien ou la commande de traitement médical | Examination procedure | 02.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.03.2011 | 29.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5630431 (TAYLOR RUSSELL HIGHSMITH [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 11, line 62 - column 14, line 28 * * column 19, line 11 - column 21, line 7; figures 2,10 *; | [X]US5769092 (WILLIAMSON JR WILLIE [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 5, line 65 - line 67; figure 4 *; | [X]WO9833451 (NASA [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 19, line 1 - page 24, line 3; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5230338 (ALLEN GEORGE S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 11 - column 6, line 3; figures 2,3 *; | [X]EP0391376 (DANON NISSIM NEJAT [IL]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-4,7,14-16 *; | [X]US5279309 (TAYLOR RUSSELL HIGHSMITH [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 22, line 3 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5799055 (PESHKIN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 30-32 * | by applicant | JPH08280710 |