EP1081014 - Steering structure of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2007/42] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nonaka, Kenji, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Noma, Kouji, c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118303.7 | 23.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | JP19990242566 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24256699 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081014 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081014 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1081014 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/02 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
B62D1/197 (EP,US);
B62D1/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2005/38] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Fahrzeuglenkstruktur | [2001/10] | English: | Steering structure of vehicle | [2001/10] | French: | Structure de direction pour véhicule | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 06.07.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, FR, GB, IT | 13.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JPH07144644 ; | [Y]DE4335511 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 10 * abstract * | [XAY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07144644 A 19950606 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 9 * abstract * [A] 1,3,7 [Y] 10 |