EP1085489 - Adhesive label [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schreiner GmbH & Co. KG Bruckmannring 22 85764 Oberschleissheim / DE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreiner, Helmut Schneeglöckchenstrasse 69 80995 München / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118410.0 | 24.08.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999145030 | 20.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19945030 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1085489 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1085489 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | [2003/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085489 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G09F3/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/14 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1481 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1486 (EP,US);
Y10T428/149 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1495 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Selbstklebeetikett | [2001/12] | English: | Adhesive label | [2001/12] | French: | Etiquette adhésive | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 10.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.03.2006 | FI | 22.03.2006 | GR | 23.06.2006 | PT | 22.08.2006 | LU | 24.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | FI | 22.03.2006 | |
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
LU | 24.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/29] | FI | 22.03.2006 | |
GR | 23.06.2006 | ||
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2008/19] | GR | 23.06.2006 | |
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | PT | 22.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 22.03.2006 | |
PT | 22.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | PT | 22.08.2006 | |
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/09] | PT | 22.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0008027 (ESSELTE PENDAFLEX CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0577977 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE4418923 (HILL THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1* figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5482779 (BAUSEWEIN VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE19754068 (SCHREINER ETIKETTEN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |