EP1081689 - Disk apparatus and its track counting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihan-Hondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC Co., Ltd. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okajima, Tadashi 3-3-11, Aoyama-cho Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118766.5 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | JP19990250525 | 03.09.1999 Original published format: JP 25052599 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1081689 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/085 | [2001/10] | CPC: |
G11B7/08541 (EP,US);
G11B19/20 (KR);
G11B7/00718 (EP,US);
G11B11/10563 (EP,US);
G11B7/08517 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/48] |
Former [2001/10] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Plattenspieler mit Spurzählsystem | [2001/10] | English: | Disk apparatus and its track counting system | [2001/10] | French: | Lecteur de disque et son système de comptage de piste | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4924483 (CHO HUN C [KR]) [X] 1-7 * column 3, lines 56-65 * * column 4, lines 44-48 * * column 4, lines 65-68 * * column 5, lines 12-19; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4974220 (HARADA TOSHIHISA [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US5901120 (MATSUI TSUTOMU [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 3,5; claim 3 *; | [A]US5844871 (MAEZAWA ETSUO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,8; claim 1 * |