EP1081950 - Automatic video multiplexer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spotware Technologies, Inc. 4545 Towne Centre Court San Diego, CA 92121-3030 / US | [2001/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colbath, Mark Allan 824 Gregory Avenue Bedford, Texas 76022 / US | [2001/10] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/10] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118797.0 | 30.08.2000 | [2001/10] | Priority number, date | US19990385979 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: US 385979 | [2001/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1081950 | Date: | 07.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1081950 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/10, G06F3/033, H04N5/765, H04N5/775, H04N5/44, H04N5/268 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
H04N7/106 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/10] | H04N7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/10] | Title | German: | Automatischer Videomultiplexer | [2001/10] | English: | Automatic video multiplexer | [2001/10] | French: | Multiplexeur vidéo automatique | [2001/10] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/39] | 23.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 21.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4347510 (ISHIGAKI YUKINOBU, et al) [X] 1,3,6-21 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 46; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,4,5; | [A]US4691361 (YOSHINO YASUHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,13,21* figure 1 *; | [A]US5264935 (NAKAJIMA YASUHISA [JP]) [A] 1,13,21 * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 36; figure 7 * |