EP1097856 - Equipment compartment with slidable hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 300 Renaissance Center Detroit Michigan 48265-3000 / US | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states General Motors Corporation 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, Michigan 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mayer, Robert R. 12349 Railroad Street Clio, Michigan 48420 / US | [2001/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/19] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00118872.1 | 31.08.2000 | [2001/19] | Priority number, date | US19990434919 | 05.11.1999 Original published format: US 434919 | [2001/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1097856 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1097856 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B62D21/15, B62D25/10 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
B62D25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2002/05] |
Former [2001/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schiebbare Haube für einen Fahrzeugmotorraum | [2001/19] | English: | Equipment compartment with slidable hood | [2001/19] | French: | Compartiment moteur avec capot coulissant | [2001/19] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/47] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.12.2005 | IT | 28.12.2005 | GB | 31.08.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/50] | IT | 28.12.2005 | |
GB | 31.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/35] | IT | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR575890 (FOROSTOVSKY) [X] 1 * page 1, line 36 - line 48; figure - *; | [X]US2837372 (ANN ODOM MARY) [X] 1,4,5 * column 1, line 34 - line 44; figure - *; | [X]US4270623 (BRANDL MICHAEL C, et al) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 24; figure - *; | [A]EP0622289 (OPEL ADAM AG [DE], et al) [A] 6* column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 * |