Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.09.2002 | Change - withdrawal | published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
21.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
31.05.2002 | Change - withdrawal | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] |
29.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
17.05.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
26.01.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.03.2001 [2001/11] |