EP1084732 - Tanning bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kopper, Iris Hellerstrasse 503 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2001/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pürschel, Dieter Hellerstrasse 503 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119212.9 | 06.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999144975 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19944975 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1084732 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1084732 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
A61N5/0614 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Bräunungsliege | [2001/12] | English: | Tanning bed | [2001/12] | French: | Lit de bronzage | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 15.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 16.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/10] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.10.2002 | 30.09.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5683437 (DOTY JOHN STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0612539 (KOENIG KLAUS [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * figures 1-8; claims 1-3 *; | [A]DE3927695 (KRATZ JOSEF GMBH [DE]) [A] * the whole document * |