EP1083066 - Annular safety support for vehicle tyre, and wheel containing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2001/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strzelczyk, Matthias, Dr. Am Alten Postweg 18 31515 Wunstorf / DE | [2001/11] | Application number, filing date | 00119215.2 | 06.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | DE1999143482 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19943482 | [2001/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1083066 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1083066 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083066 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60C17/04, B60C17/06 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
B60C15/0203 (EP);
B60C15/0206 (EP);
B60C15/0213 (EP);
B60C17/047 (EP);
B60C17/06 (EP);
B60C2017/068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/35] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ringförmiger Notlaufstützkörper für Fahrzeugreifen, und Rad mit demselben | [2001/11] | English: | Annular safety support for vehicle tyre, and wheel containing the same | [2001/11] | French: | Appui annulaire de sécurité pour pneu de véhicule, et roue pourvue d'un tel appui | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 08.03.2006 | GB | 08.03.2006 | IT | 08.03.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/35] | GB | 08.03.2006 | |
IT | 08.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | GB | 08.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0158039 (UNIROYAL ENGLEBERT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,12,15 * page 2, line 30 - line 32 * * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * figure 1; claims 1-3 *; | [X]US5450887 (HABAY EMMANUEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,11,12,15 * column 4, line 7 - line 55; figure 1 *; | [PX]WO0024598 (ROSSI RINO [IT]) [PX] 1-5,8,11,12,15 * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 19 * * page 14, line 12 - line 20 * * figures 2,5 *; | [A]DE3605803 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 17 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 61; figure . *; | [A]US1932191 (SHOEMAKER ALVIN H) [A] 17 * page 1, line 65 - line 89; figure 1 * |