EP1085609 - Electrical socket contact with guide rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [2003/35] |
Former [2003/29] | For all designated states FCI Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Steffen Leerstetterstrasse 98 90469 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Lutsch, Harald Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 41 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119427.3 | 13.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE19991044280 | 15.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19944280 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085609 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085609 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/115 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H01R13/18 (EP,US);
H01R13/113 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Buchsenkontakt mit Führungsschienen | [2003/37] | English: | Electrical socket contact with guide rail | [2001/12] | French: | Contact à douille électrique avec un rail de guidage | [2001/12] |
Former [2001/12] | Elektrischer Buchsenkontakt mit Führungsscchienen | Examination procedure | 11.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 28.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.02.2004 | BE | 04.02.2004 | CH | 04.02.2004 | CY | 04.02.2004 | FI | 04.02.2004 | LI | 04.02.2004 | NL | 04.02.2004 | DK | 04.05.2004 | GR | 04.05.2004 | SE | 04.05.2004 | DE | 05.05.2004 | ES | 15.05.2004 | PT | 04.07.2004 | IE | 13.09.2004 | LU | 13.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
CY | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
NL | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
DE | 05.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
IE | 13.09.2004 | ||
LU | 13.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
NL | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
DE | 05.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
IE | 13.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
DE | 05.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
IE | 13.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
DE | 05.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
DE | 05.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
DK | 04.05.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
BE | 04.02.2004 | ||
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
ES | 15.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
CH | 04.02.2004 | ||
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
LI | 04.02.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 04.02.2004 | |
FI | 04.02.2004 | ||
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 04.02.2004 | |
GR | 04.05.2004 | ||
SE | 04.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 04.02.2004 | |
SE | 04.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0189821 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]GB2228150 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8* abstract *; | [A]EP0669678 (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 9, line 1 - column 10, line 12; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US5616041 (BROWN DONALD C [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, lines 33-65; figures 2,3,5 * | Examination | US5868590 |