EP1083471 - Voltage regulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [2003/10] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics SA 7, avenue Gallieni 94250 Gentilly Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gailhard, Bruno 11 Avenue Pasteur 13530 Trets / FR | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Marchand, André Omnipat 610, chemin de Fabrègues 13510 Éguilles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | Marchand, André OMNIPAT, 24 Place des Martyrs de la Résistance 13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR | Application number, filing date | 00119687.2 | 08.09.2000 | [2001/11] | Priority number, date | FR19990011492 | 10.09.1999 Original published format: FR 9911492 | [2001/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1083471 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1083471 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05F1/46, H03K17/56, G05F1/565 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
G05F1/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/49] |
Former [2001/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Spannungsregler | [2001/11] | English: | Voltage regulator | [2001/11] | French: | Régulateur de tension | [2001/11] | Examination procedure | 09.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 24.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 17.11.2004 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5861737 (GOERKE ULRICH B [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0309922 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - KMETZ G L, "SOFT-START REGULATOR STARTS AT OV", EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS,US,CAHNERS PUBLISHING CO. NEWTON, MASSACHUSETTS, (19960606), vol. 41, no. 12, ISSN 0012-7515, page 104,106, XP000622006 [A] 1-10 * abstract * |