EP1086997 - Ink, ink-set, and image recording process for improving density of ink-jet recorded image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/48] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osumi, Koichi Canon K.K., 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Mishina, Shinya Canon K.K., 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Watanabe, Tomonari Canon K.K., 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/13] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00119994.2 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990264618 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26461899 | JP20000189396 | 23.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000189396 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1086997 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1086997 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086997 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41J2/14 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
C09D11/324 (EP,US);
B41J2/14016 (EP,US);
B41J2/1433 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14169 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14387 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14475 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/13] | C09D11/00, B41J2/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/42] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tinte, Tintensatz und Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren zur Verbesserung der Dichtheit von tintenstrahlbedruckten Bildern | [2001/13] | English: | Ink, ink-set, and image recording process for improving density of ink-jet recorded image | [2001/13] | French: | Encre, assortiment d'encres et procédé d'enregistrement pour améliorer la densité des caractères imprimés par jet d'encre | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Request for further processing for: | 26.01.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0913438 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,2,9,10,12 * * claims 1-48 * [A] 8-24; | [X]US5734403 (SUGA YUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7 * claims 1,7,9 *; | [A]WO9618695 (CABOT CORP [US]) [A] 1-24 * claims 1,30,32 * |