EP1085618 - Connector system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TYCO Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / SG / CH | [2006/19] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Tyco Electronics Logistics AG AMPèrestrasse 3 9323 Steinach / SG / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanbesien, Johan Meenseweg 464 8902 Ieper / BE | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Hirsch, Peter Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120023.7 | 14.09.2000 | [2001/12] | Priority number, date | DE1999144705 | 17.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19944705 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1085618 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1085618 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/645 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H01R13/645 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/50] |
Former [2001/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steckverbindungssystem | [2001/12] | English: | Connector system | [2001/12] | French: | Système de connecteurs | [2001/12] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 22.09.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.11.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.11.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE29817007U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * page 3, line 4 - page 3, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]US5888101 (DENT PETER [GB], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]US4159862 (FUNCK GORDON W, et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 17; figure 4 * |