EP1193642 - System and method for object recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MVTec Software GmbH Neherstrasse 1 81675 München / DE | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steger, Carsten Dr. Nelly-Sachs-Str.5 85386 Eching / DE | [2005/24] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Sieger, Carsten Dr. Nelly-Sachs-Str.5 85386 Eching / DE | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/14] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120269.6 | 27.09.2000 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193642 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1193642 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/64 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
G06V10/7515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/14] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Objekterkennung | [2004/41] | English: | System and method for object recognition | [2002/14] | French: | Système et procédé de reconnaissance d'objets | [2002/14] |
Former [2002/14] | System und Verfahren zum Erkennen von Gegenständen | Examination procedure | 03.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 20.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2005 | BE | 30.03.2005 | CH | 30.03.2005 | ES | 30.03.2005 | LI | 30.03.2005 | NL | 30.03.2005 | DK | 30.06.2005 | GR | 30.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | CY | 27.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2007/08] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
BE | 30.03.2005 | ||
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
ES | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
BE | 30.03.2005 | ||
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
BE | 30.03.2005 | ||
CH | 30.03.2005 | ||
LI | 30.03.2005 | ||
NL | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
GR | 30.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
BE | 30.03.2005 | ||
DK | 30.06.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 30.03.2005 | |
BE | 30.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5550933 (STETTEN GEORGE D [US]) [A] 1,15,17,18 * column 3, line 43 - column 5, line 37 *; | [A]US5631981 (RAO ARUN [US]) [A] 1,15,17,18 * abstract *; | [YD]US6005978 (GARAKANI ARMAN [US]) [YD] 2,16 * abstract *; | [A]US6023530 (WILSON STEPHEN S [US]) [A] 1,15,17,18* abstract *; | [XY] - MANABU HASHIMOTO, "HIGH-SPEED TEMPLATE MATCHING ALGORITHM USING INFORMATION OF CONTOUR POINTS", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN,US,SCRIPTA TECHNICA JOURNALS. NEW YORK, (1992), vol. 23, no. 9, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 78 - 87, XP000334342 [X] 1,15,17,18 * chapters 2, 5 * [Y] 2,16 |