EP1068955 - Device for changing the amplitude of the axial oscillation of an inking roller in a rotary printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beisel, Hermann Zeppelinstrasse 5 69190 Walldorf / DE | 02 /
Junghans, Rudi Johann-Wilhelm-Strasse 79 69259 Wilhelmsfeld / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 00120285.2 | 23.11.1998 | [2001/03] | Priority number, date | DE1997156077 | 17.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19756077 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068955 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068955 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/15 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
B41F31/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2001/03] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Veränderung der Hubamplitude einer Reibwalze in einer Rotationsdruckmaschine | [2001/03] | English: | Device for changing the amplitude of the axial oscillation of an inking roller in a rotary printing machine | [2001/03] | French: | Dispositif pour changer l'amplitude de l'oscillation axiale d'un rouleau d'encrage dans une machine rotative d'impression | [2001/03] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 02.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98122118.7 / EP0924072 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2001 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.05.2003 | NL | 21.05.2003 | BE | 30.11.2003 | [2007/35] |
Former [2005/01] | NL | 21.05.2003 | |
BE | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 21.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4513663 (HUMMEL PETER [DE], et al); | [AD]DE3629825 (ADAMOVSKE STROJIRNY KP ZVS [CS]); | [AD]DE2507179 (POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG) |