EP1109129 - IC card with self-diagnostic function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2007 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | ||
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuriyama, Ryouichi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1-1 Shibaura, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/26] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/25] | Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120392.6 | 18.09.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | JP19990353176 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35317699 | JP20000271686 | 07.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000271686 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109129 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109129 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | [2002/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109129 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/073, G06F11/267 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
G06K7/0095 (EP,US);
G06F11/27 (EP,US);
G06K19/073 (EP,US);
G06F11/2733 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/12] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | IC-Karte mit Selbstdiagnosefunktion | [2001/25] | English: | IC card with self-diagnostic function | [2001/25] | French: | Carte à puce munie d'une fonction d'autodiagnostic | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 18.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05018518.0 / EP1615164 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01026995 ; | [DA]US4939353 (IIJIMA YASUO [JP]) [DA] 1 * column 4, line 3 - column 7, line 10; figures 7-10 *; | [A]US5581708 (IIJIMA YASUO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 21-37; figure 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890517), vol. 013, no. 210, Database accession no. (P - 872), & JP01026995 A 19890130 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |