Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
10.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
12.03.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
25.02.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
25.02.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
13.12.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.10.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 17.12.2003 [2003/51] |
03.10.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.08.2003 | First examination report | |
31.07.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
20.06.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.08.2003 [2003/32] |
07.02.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
07.02.2003 | Change - classification | published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
04.10.2002 | Renewal fee | |
23.03.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.05.2001 [2001/19] |