EP1086920 - Automatic winder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho Kisshoin, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi 601 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mima, Hiroshi 10-48, Terada Syakugo Jouyou-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Yiochi Murata Kikai Syataku 208-gou, 47, Funato-cho Kisshoin, Minami-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Liedl, Christine, Dipl.-Chem., et al Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120396.7 | 18.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | JP19990266436 | 21.09.1999 Original published format: JP 26643699 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1086920 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1086920 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/06 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B65H54/70 (EP,US);
B65H67/067 (EP,US);
B65H67/069 (EP,US);
B65H67/088 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2003/09] |
Former [2001/13] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Automatische Aufspulmaschine | [2001/13] | English: | Automatic winder | [2001/13] | French: | Bobinoir automatique | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 13.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4576341 (MATSUI ISAMU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]CH660872 (MAYER TEXTILMASCHF); | [A]US5328110 (WIRTZ ULRICH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 66 * |