EP1188455 - Device for delivering the content of a sealed container filled with liquid, paste or gas [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRANSCOJECT GESELLSCHAFT FÜR MEDIZINISCHE GERÄTE mbH & CO. KG Rügenstrasse 8 24539 Neumünster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | For all designated states TRANSCOJECT GESELLSCHAFT FÜR MEDIZINISCHE GERÄTE mbH & CO. KG Rügenstrasse 8 24539 Neumünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rolle, Philipp Marianstrasse 53 24534 Neumünster / DE | [2002/12] | Representative(s) | Vollmann, Heiko Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstrasse 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/12] | Vollmann, Heiko, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wilcken & Vollmann, Bei der Lohmühle 23 23554 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120455.1 | 19.09.2000 | [2002/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1188455 | Date: | 20.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/19, B01F13/00 | [2002/12] | CPC: |
A61B17/00491 (EP);
A61C5/64 (EP);
A61M5/2429 (EP);
B01F33/5011 (EP);
B01F33/50112 (EP);
B01F35/713 (EP);
B01F35/7164 (EP);
A61B2017/00495 (EP);
A61M5/19 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2002/50] |
Former [2002/12] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Austragen des Inhalts eines dicht abgeschlossenen, flüssigkeits-, pasten- oder gasgefüllten Behältnisses | [2002/12] | English: | Device for delivering the content of a sealed container filled with liquid, paste or gas | [2002/12] | French: | Dispositif d'extraction du contenu d'un récipient scellé rempli de liquide, d'une pâte ou de gaz | [2002/12] | Examination procedure | 24.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.11.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5454792 (TENNICAN PATRICK O [US], et al) [A] 10* figures 5-10 *; | [XY]WO9714460 (SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 9, line 26 - column 14, line 6; figures 1-6 * [Y] 5,9; | [Y]US5814022 (ANTANAVICH RICHARD D [US], et al) [Y] 5,9 * column 5, line 31 - line 65; figures 1,3,4 * |