EP1134621 - Toner for the development of electrostatic image, process for the preparation thereof, developer for the development of electrostatic image, and process for the formation of image [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/06] |
Former [2001/38] | For all designated states FUJI XEROX CO., LTD. 17-22, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maehata, Hideo, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1600, Takematsu Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Matsumura, Yasuo, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1600, Takematsu Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Yoshizawa, Hisae, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1600, Takematsu Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Suwabe, Masaaki, c/o Fuji Xerox Co., Ltd. 1600, Takematsu Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2001/38] | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/38] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, Dr. rer. nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120577.2 | 20.09.2000 | [2001/38] | Priority number, date | JP20000071570 | 15.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000071570 | [2001/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1134621 | Date: | 19.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1134621 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/097, G03G9/08 | [2001/38] | CPC: |
G03G9/097 (EP,US);
G03G9/08 (KR);
G03G9/0827 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/23] |
Former [2001/38] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Toner für die Entwicklung elektrostatischer Bilder, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, Entwickler für die Entwicklung elektrostatischer Bilder, und Bildherstellungsverfahren | [2001/38] | English: | Toner for the development of electrostatic image, process for the preparation thereof, developer for the development of electrostatic image, and process for the formation of image | [2001/38] | French: | Révélateur pour le développement d' images électrostatiques, procédé pour leur préparation, agent de développement pour le développement d' images électrostatiques et procédé de production d' images | [2001/38] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2001 | Examination requested [2002/04] | 22.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2007
14.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-Chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Chivarov, Georgi TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2007
14.11.2007
WITHDRAWN Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-Chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Chivarov, Georgi Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.11.2007
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-Chome Ohta-Ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP Opponent's representative Chivarov, Georgi Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | 18.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.02.2009 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5340678 (SUZUKI CHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 7 * column 7, line 38 - line 64; claims 4,5 * [A] 1; | [X]EP0867778 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 7 * page 19, line 5 - line 8; claim 30 *; | [A]JPH0572798 ; | [A]JPH07271090 ; | [A]JPH10228129 ; | [A]JPH09211892 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1993, no. 17, Database accession no. 1993-137495, XP002152371 & JPH0572798 A 19930326 (TDK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07271090 A 19951020 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 44, Database accession no. 1998-516333, XP002152372 & JPH10228129 A 19980825 (TOKYO INK) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, no. 43, Database accession no. 1997-461819, XP002152373 & JPH09211892 A 19970815 (RICOH) [A] 1 * abstract * |