EP1087303 - Method and system for generating web pages with information displayed in a carousel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GoodHome.com 899 Northgate Drive, 4th Floor San Rafael California 94903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states GoodHome.com 899 Northgate Drive, 4th Floor San Rafael, California 94903 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hakman, Kevin 663 Battery Street Suite 119 San Francisco California 94111 / US | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120662.2 | 21.09.2000 | [2001/13] | Priority number, date | US19990183040P | 22.09.1999 Original published format: US 183040 P | US20000649275 | 28.08.2000 Original published format: US 649275 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1087303 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/13] | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/033 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/0485 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Erstellen von Web-Seiten mit in einem Karussel angezeigter Information | [2001/13] | English: | Method and system for generating web pages with information displayed in a carousel | [2001/13] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour générer des pages Web avec des informations affichées dans un carroussel | [2001/13] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 23.05.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |