EP1072714 - Method for washing the laundry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 03.10.2007 [2007/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien Henkelstrasse 67 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [2001/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Rudolf Am Nettchesfeld 51 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Jobs, Jörn Clörather Mühle 34 41749 Viersen / DE | [2001/05] | Representative(s) | Müller, Enno, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/05] | Müller, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 00120798.4 | 11.01.1989 | [2001/05] | Priority number, date | DE19880001919U | 15.02.1988 Original published format: DE 8801919 U | DE19880012795U | 12.10.1988 Original published format: DE 8812795 U | [2001/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1072714 | Date: | 31.01.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1072714 | Date: | 02.05.2002 | [2002/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1072714 | Date: | 21.07.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2001/05] | CPC: |
C11D17/046 (EP,US);
A61K8/0208 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
C11D17/041 (EP);
C11D3/0036 (EP);
D06F39/024 (EP,US);
D06F58/203 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2001/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Wäsche waschen | [2001/05] | English: | Method for washing the laundry | [2001/05] | French: | Procédé pour laver le linge | [2001/05] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 04.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP89100395.6 / EP0345409 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.10.2004 | SE | 21.10.2004 | LU | 11.01.2005 | AT | 31.01.2005 | BE | 31.01.2005 | CH | 31.01.2005 | LI | 31.01.2005 | [2007/40] |
Former [2007/08] | NL | 21.07.2004 | |
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
LU | 11.01.2005 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/23] | NL | 21.07.2004 | |
GR | 21.10.2004 | ||
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | GR | 21.10.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
CH | 31.01.2005 | ||
LI | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GR | 21.10.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
BE | 31.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/18] | GR | 21.10.2004 | |
SE | 21.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 21.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB302416 (JAMES BEATTIE COPLAND) [A] 1,2* figure -; claim - *; | [A]US3048993 (LUCAS MALCOLM B, et al) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 55 - line 61; figures 9,10; claim 6 *; | [A]US3400808 (JOHN RICHTER VIRGIL) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]GB1298454 (LANTOR LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |