EP1071113 - Plasma reactors for processing semiconductor wafers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2007 [2007/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Loewenhardt, Peter K. 5602 Selena Court Pleasanton, California 94566 / US | 02 /
Yin, Gerald Zheyao 10132 Bilich Place Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
Salzman, Philip M. 2282 Fairglen Drive California 95125 / US | [2001/14] |
Former [2001/04] | 01 /
Loewenhardt, Peter K. 812-900 Pepper Tree Lane Santa Clara, California / US | ||
02 /
Yin, Gerald Zheyao 1063 Morse Avenue 17-205 Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | |||
03 /
Salzman, Philip M. 2282 Fairglen Drive California 95125 / US | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/04] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 00121003.8 | 24.12.1996 | [2001/04] | Priority number, date | US19960590998 | 24.01.1996 Original published format: US 590998 | [2001/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1071113 | Date: | 24.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/04] | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2001/04] | CPC: |
H01J37/3266 (EP,US);
H01L21/306 (KR);
H01J37/321 (EP,US);
H01J37/32834 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2001/04] | Title | German: | Plasmareaktoren zur Behandlung von Halbleiterscheiben | [2001/04] | English: | Plasma reactors for processing semiconductor wafers | [2001/04] | French: | Réacteurs à plasma pour le traitement de tranches semi-conductrices | [2001/04] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 01.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/12] | 23.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/12] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96309551.8 / EP0786794 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.2006 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |