EP1088862 - Ink set for color ink-jet recording, and recording method, recording apparatus, ink cartridge, recording unit and reduction of bleeding, employing the ink set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Yoichi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takizawa, Yoshihisa, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Teraoka, Hisashi, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yakushigawa, Yuko, Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121197.8 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990280108 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 28010899 | JP19990280109 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: JP 28010999 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088862 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088862 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14169 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/01] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Tintensatz für Farbtintenstrahl-Aufzeichnung und Aufzeichnungsverfahren, Aufzeichnungsgerät, Tintenpatrone, Aufzeichnungseinheit und Reduzierung von Farbvermischung mit diesem Tintensatz | [2001/14] | English: | Ink set for color ink-jet recording, and recording method, recording apparatus, ink cartridge, recording unit and reduction of bleeding, employing the ink set | [2001/14] | French: | Assortiment d'encre pour l'enregistrement en couleur par jet d'encre et procédé d'enregistrement, appareil d'enregistrement, réservoir d'encre, unité d'enregistrement et diminution du mélange des couleurs utilisant cet assortiment d'encre | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 16.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.05.2004 | [2007/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0867485 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,15,16,25 * column 7, lines 11-48 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 34 * * column 10, lines 8-54 *; | [A]EP0943666 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,15-17,20,22,25 * paragraphs [0048] - [0053] * * paragraphs [0146] - [0148] *; | [A]EP0879857 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,15-17,20,22,25 * page 6, line 57 - page 8, line 30 * * page 9, line 47 - page 10, line 9 * * examples 11-16 *; | [A]EP0838507 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]); | [AD]JPH10183046 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) |