EP1091034 - Method and device for self-learning the position of electromechanical actuators, particularly for circular textile machines and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATEC S.p.A. Via delle Nazioni Unite 1 50018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states Matec S.p.A. Via delle Nazioni Unite 1 50018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandani, Paolo Via Pistelli 9 5018 Scandicci (Firenze) / IT | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00121244.8 | 02.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI02100 | 07.10.1999 Original published format: IT MI992100 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1091034 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1091034 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/66 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
D04B15/66 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/48] |
Former [2001/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Selbstlernen der Position von elektromechanischen Stellgliedern, insbesonderes für Rundstrickmaschinen und dergleichen | [2001/15] | English: | Method and device for self-learning the position of electromechanical actuators, particularly for circular textile machines and the like | [2001/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'autoaprentissage de la position d'actionneurs électromécaniques, notamment pour métiers à tricoter circulaires et similaire | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/40] | 09.12.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2060202 (SAVIO SPA) [A] 1* page 1, line 101 - line 125; figure 1A *; | [A]US4697438 (MUELLER HARTWIG [DD], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 54 - column 5, line 66; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0259123 (DRAPER CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 22, line 3 - line 47; figure 31; claims 1,3 *; | [PX]EP0962571 (MATEC SPA [IT]) [PX] 6-8 * column 2, line 17 - column 6, line 3; figures 1,3 * |