EP1093111 - Amplitude control for speech synthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amano, Katsumi, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 02 /
Cho, Shisei, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 03 /
Toyama, Soichi, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | 04 /
Ishihara, Hiroyuki, Pioneer Corporation Corporate R&D Laboratory, 6-1-1, Fujimi Tsurugashima-shi, Saitama 350-2288 / JP | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen, Rings & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Klingseisen, Franz, et al Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Klingseisen, Franz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte, Dr. F. Zumstein, Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen, Postfach 10 15 61 80089 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121304.0 | 06.10.2000 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | JP19990294357 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29435799 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093111 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093111 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | [2002/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093111 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G10L13/06, G10L13/04 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
G10L13/04 (EP,US);
G10L13/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/21] |
Former [2001/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Amplitudensteuerung für die Sprachsynthese | [2001/16] | English: | Amplitude control for speech synthesis | [2001/16] | French: | Contrôle d'amplitude pour la synthèse de la parole | [2005/11] |
Former [2001/16] | Contrôle d'amplitude pour la synthèse de parole | Examination procedure | 16.10.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 13.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0427485 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 4, line 11 - line 17 * * page 6, line 11 - line 50 * * page 15, line 39 - line 52 * * page 16, line 27 - line 32 *; | [A]WO9627870 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 4 - line 29 *; | [A]WO9835340 (ENTROPIC RESEARCH LAB INC [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract ** page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 5 * |