EP1088644 - Deformation correcting method and apparatus for sheet materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/14] | Deformation correcting method, cutting method, deformation correcting apparatus and cutting apparatus for sheet materials | ||
[2005/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP | ||
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken, 250-0193 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagame, Masami Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken 418-8666 / JP | 02 /
Nishida, Hiroyuki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken 418-8666 / JP | 03 /
Kanada, Seiji Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken 418-8666 / JP | 04 /
Endo, Keisuke Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken 418-8666 / JP | 05 /
Negishi, Yoshihisa Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP | 06 /
Oyamada, Takayoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 210, Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken 250-0193 / JP | 07 /
Nakaseko, Takayoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 200, Oonakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka-ken 418-8666 / JP | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121459.2 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | JP19990282190 | 01.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28219099 | JP20000035479 | 14.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000035479 | JP20000043497 | 21.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000043497 | JP20000078901 | 21.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000078901 | JP20000093618 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000093618 | JP20000099577 | 31.03.2000 Original published format: JP 2000099577 | JP20000267836 | 04.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000267836 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088644 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088644 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088644 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/18, B65H23/34, G03C1/81, B26D7/10 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B26D1/0006 (EP,US);
B26D7/10 (EP,US);
B26D9/00 (EP,US);
B29C53/18 (EP,US);
B32B43/003 (EP,US);
B65H23/34 (EP,US);
B26D1/085 (EP,US);
B26D1/225 (EP,US);
B26D2001/004 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0046 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0053 (EP,US);
B26D2001/0066 (EP,US);
B26D7/32 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4148 (EP,US);
Y10T83/041 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/14] | B29C53/18, B65H23/34, B26D7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Korrektur der Verformung von Blattmaterialien | [2005/01] | English: | Deformation correcting method and apparatus for sheet materials | [2005/01] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour corriger une déformation de matériaux en feuille | [2005/01] |
Former [2001/14] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Korrektur der Verformung und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Schneiden von Blattmaterialien | ||
Former [2001/14] | Deformation correcting method, cutting method, deformation correcting apparatus and cutting apparatus for sheet materials | ||
Former [2001/14] | Procédé et appareil pour corriger une déformation de matériaux en feuille, et procédé et appareil pour couper des matériaux en feuille | Examination procedure | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05006018.5 / EP1541301 | EP06003987.2 / EP1679162 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.2005 | BE | 20.07.2005 | CH | 20.07.2005 | FI | 20.07.2005 | FR | 20.07.2005 | IT | 20.07.2005 | LI | 20.07.2005 | CY | 29.09.2005 | IE | 29.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | DK | 20.10.2005 | GB | 20.10.2005 | GR | 20.10.2005 | SE | 20.10.2005 | ES | 31.10.2005 | PT | 21.12.2005 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/40] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 29.09.2005 | ||
FR | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/35] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IT | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 29.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
CY | 29.09.2005 | ||
IE | 29.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 29.09.2005 | ||
LU | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GB | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/40] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
IE | 29.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
DK | 20.10.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
BE | 20.07.2005 | ||
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
CH | 20.07.2005 | ||
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
LI | 20.07.2005 | ||
GR | 20.10.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | ||
ES | 31.10.2005 | ||
PT | 21.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 20.07.2005 | |
FI | 20.07.2005 | ||
SE | 20.10.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0664145 ; | [DX]JPH0985680 ; | [A]US4660964 (YOSHIKAWA SUMIO [JP], et al) [A] 23 * column 2, line 42 - line 64 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]US5325144 (YOSHIKAWA SUMIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,14,27,35,39,42 * column 18, line 16 - column 21, line 35; figure 3 * * column 27, line 12 - line 30 * [Y] 8,17,45; | [A]EP0679947 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [A] 11 * column 10, line 52 - column 11, line 7 *; | [Y]US5861083 (KLOCKENKEMPER JEROME J [US], et al) [Y] 17,45 * column 5, line 44 - line 54 * * column 13, line 5 - line 18 *; | [A]US5876827 (FINK WILBERT E [US], et al) [A] 17,35 * column 7, line 10 - column 8, line 19 * * figures 4A,4B * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940610), vol. 018, no. 304, Database accession no. (M - 1619), & JP06064145 A 19940308 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 8 * abstract * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09085680 A 19970331 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [DX] 48-55 * abstract * | Examination | US3939000 |