EP1088985 - High pressure fuel injector for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augustin, Ulrich, Dr. Schillerstrasse 25/1 71394 Kernen / DE | 02 /
Baranowski, Dirk, Dr. Herzog-Heinrich-Strasse 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
Frank, Wilhelm Meinhardtstrasse 44 96049 Bamberg / DE | 04 /
Klügl, Wendelin Föhrenstrasse 1 92358 Seubersdorf / DE | 05 /
Lewentz, Günther Fatimastrasse 13 93093 Donaustauf / DE | 06 /
Lixl, Heinz Brunhuberstrasse 12a 93053 Regensburg / DE | 07 /
Schmutzler, Gerd, Dr. Blütenstrasse 28 93138 Kareth / DE | [2004/50] |
Former [2001/14] | 01 /
Augustin, Ulrich, Dr. Schillerstrasse 25/1 71394 Kernen / DE | ||
02 /
Baranowski, Dirk, Dr. Herzog-Heinrich-Strasse 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Frank, Wilhelm Meinhardtstrasse 44 96049 Bamberg / DE | |||
04 /
Klügl, Wendelin Föhrenstrasse 1 92358 Seubersdorf / DE | |||
05 /
Lewentz, Günter Lärchenweg 5 93055 Regensburg / DE | |||
06 /
Lixl, Heinz Brunhuberstrasse 12a 93053 Regensburg / DE | |||
07 /
Schmutzler, Gerd, Dr. Blütenstrasse 28 93138 Kareth / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121484.0 | 29.09.2000 | [2001/14] | Priority number, date | DE1999146766 | 29.09.1999 Original published format: DE 19946766 | [2001/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1088985 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1088985 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088985 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02, F02M61/10, F02M61/12, F02M61/20, F02M61/16 | [2003/47] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP);
F02M61/12 (EP);
F02M61/168 (EP);
F02M61/20 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/14] | F02M47/02, F02M59/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/33] |
Former [2001/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Injektor für eine Brennkraftmaschine mit Direkteinspritzung | [2001/14] | English: | High pressure fuel injector for an internal combustion engine | [2001/14] | French: | Injecteur de carburant pour injection directe dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2001/14] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 20.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 22.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0921301 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [X] 1-4,6,7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5; | [Y]DE4203343 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * column 3, lines 29-40; figures 1-4; claims 5,6 *; | [X]US5671715 (TSUZUKI YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * column 13, line 10 - column 15, line 28; figures 10,13A-B *; | [X]US4826080 (GANSER MARCO A [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,6,8 * column 10, line 20 - line 25; figures 1-4,6 *; | [X]US5860597 (TARR YUL J [US]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * column 5, line 12 - column 9, line 55; figures 1-3,5A-D * |