EP1091623 - Heating conductor with raccording element and/or closing element and its manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2005/36] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states EADS Airbus GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meisiek, Jürgen Fasanenweg 27 25587 Münsterdorf / DE | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Hansmann, Dierk, et al Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Hansmann, Dierk, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hansmann-Klickow-Hansmann Jessenstrasse 4 22767 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121536.7 | 30.09.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | DE19991048819 | 09.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19948819 | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1091623 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1091623 | Date: | 29.05.2002 | [2002/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1091623 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/04, H05B3/06, C08L27/12, H01R4/70, H05B3/56 | [2002/22] | CPC: |
H05B3/56 (EP,US);
H05B3/06 (EP,US);
H05B3/565 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | H05B3/04, H05B3/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Heizleiter mit einem Anschlusselement und/oder einem Abschlusselement sowie ein Verfahren zur Herstellung desselben | [2001/15] | English: | Heating conductor with raccording element and/or closing element and its manufacturing process | [2001/15] | French: | Conducteur chauffant muni d'un élément de raccord et/ou d'un élément de fermeture ainsi que son procédé de fabrication | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/37] | 08.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 07.09.2005 | IE | 07.09.2005 | NL | 07.09.2005 | AT | 30.09.2005 | BE | 30.09.2005 | CH | 30.09.2005 | CY | 30.09.2005 | FR | 30.09.2005 | LI | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | ES | 01.10.2005 | LU | 07.11.2005 | DK | 07.12.2005 | GR | 07.12.2005 | SE | 07.12.2005 | PT | 07.02.2006 | [2018/39] |
Former [2010/20] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
CY | 30.09.2005 | ||
FR | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
ES | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2008/40] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
CY | 30.09.2005 | ||
FR | 30.09.2005 | ||
IT | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
ES | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/34] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
CY | 30.09.2005 | ||
IT | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
ES | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
CY | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
ES | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
ES | 01.10.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
LU | 07.11.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
AT | 30.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
CH | 30.09.2005 | ||
LI | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
IE | 07.09.2005 | ||
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
BE | 30.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
DK | 07.12.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/30] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
PT | 07.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/22] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
NL | 07.09.2005 | ||
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
GR | 07.12.2005 | ||
SE | 07.12.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 07.09.2005 | |
SE | 07.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4277673 (KELLY CORNELIUS J N) [A] 18,33 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4484022 (EILENTROPP HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [Y]DE3428460 (WAGNER KABELWERK [DE]) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 3 * * claim 1 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]EP0779334 (EILENTROPP KG [DE]) [Y] 1,9 * abstract * * column 1, lines 34-59 * * column 3, lines 42-52 * * claim 15 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]EP0893844 (DAIMLER BENZ AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 5 * |