EP1193248 - Malonamid and malonamic ester derivatives with antithrombotic activity, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma Deutschland GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2002/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schudok, Manfred Dr. Eberlestrasse 28 65817 Eppstein / DE | 02 /
Klingler, Otmar Dr. Leipziger Ring 363 63110 Rodgau / DE | 03 /
Nestler, Hans-Peter Dr. Sendelbacher Weg 46 65779 Kelkheim / DE | 04 /
Matter, Hans Dr. Feldbergring 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | 05 /
Schreuder, Hermann Dr. Jahnstrasse 22 65179 Hofheim-Lorsbach / DE | [2002/17] |
Former [2002/14] | 01 /
Schudok, Manfred Dr. Eberlestrasse 28 65817 Eppstein / DE | ||
02 /
Klingler, Otmar Dr. Leipziger Ring 363 63110 Rodgau / DE | |||
03 /
Nestler, Hans-Peter Dr. Sendelbacher Weg 46 65779 Kelkheim / DE | |||
04 /
Matter, Hans Dr. Feldbergring 37 63505 Langenselbold / DE | |||
05 /
Schreuder, Hermann Dr. Hallwielweg 21 65779 Kelkheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121551.6 | 30.09.2000 | [2002/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1193248 | Date: | 03.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07C257/18, C07C257/20, A61K31/155, A61P7/02 | [2002/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/225 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2003/01] |
Former [2002/14] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Malonamid- und Malonsäureamid-ester-Derivate mit antithrombotischer Wirkung, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [2002/14] | English: | Malonamid and malonamic ester derivatives with antithrombotic activity, their preparation and their use | [2002/14] | French: | Dérivés de malonamide et d'ester malonamique possédant une activité antithrombotique, leur préparation et leur emploi | [2002/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/30] | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9748706 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO9749684 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0001704 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A] - HALL J.E. ET AL., "Anti-Pneumoncystis Activities of Aromatic Diamidoxime Prodrugs", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199803), vol. 42, no. 3, pages 666 - 674, XP000974178 [A] 1-6 * examples 13,14; table 1 * | [A] - DAVIES G.E. & LOWE J.S., "The Inhibition of Guinea-Pig Plasma Kallikrein by Amidines", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY, (1970), vol. 8, pages 453 - 460, XP000983306 [A] 1-6 * page 454, line 47 - line 48 * |