EP1093931 - Multi-drum type rotary stencil printer with selectively rotatable printing drums [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riso Kagaku Corporation 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | For all designated states RISO KAGAKU CORPORATION 2-20-15, Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motoe, Katsuro, Riso Kagaku Corp. 1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda Amimachi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeno, Mitsuru, Riso Kagaku Corp. 1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda Amimachi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Miyata, Masakazu, Riso Kagaku Corp. 1339-2, Wakaguri, Nishikanda Amimachi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2001/17] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/17] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121706.6 | 04.10.2000 | [2001/17] | Priority number, date | JP19990299541 | 21.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29954199 | [2001/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1093931 | Date: | 25.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1093931 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B41L13/06, B41L13/16 | [2001/17] | CPC: |
B41L13/06 (EP,US);
B41L13/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/03] |
Former [2001/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Rotationsschablonendruckmaschine mit mehreren wählbaren, drehbaren Druckzylindern | [2001/17] | English: | Multi-drum type rotary stencil printer with selectively rotatable printing drums | [2001/17] | French: | Machine rotative d'impression par stencil à plusieurs cylindres d'impression à rotation selective | [2001/17] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 04.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0654359 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0897807 (RISO KAGAKU CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * claim - * |