EP1090794 - Apparatus capable of driving hybrid vehicle in reverse direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshiya, Kazumi, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1,Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Oba, Hidehiro, c/o Toyota Jidosha K.K. 1,Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/15] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte, Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Bavariaring 10 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00121968.2 | 09.10.2000 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | JP19990287933 | 08.10.1999 Original published format: JP 28793399 | [2001/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1090794 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1090794 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1090794 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04, B60K6/02, B60K41/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W30/18036 (EP,US);
B60W2710/025 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0644 (EP,US);
F16H3/54 (EP,US);
F16H3/724 (EP,US);
F16H61/66 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/903 (EP,US);
Y10S903/909 (EP,US);
Y10S903/91 (EP,US);
Y10S903/918 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/15] | B60K6/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/02] |
Former [2001/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Rückwärtsfahren für ein Hybrid-Fahrzeug | [2001/15] | English: | Apparatus capable of driving hybrid vehicle in reverse direction | [2001/15] | French: | Dispositif de marche arrière pour un véhicule hybride | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]DE10002133 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [PX] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]US5433282 (MOROTO SHUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]DE19629235 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract *; | [A]EP0036667 (FORD WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * | Examination | EP1038722 | WO9929533 | by applicant | JPH0937411 | JP2000092612 |