EP1109305 - Magnetic levitation control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriyama, Shinichi 335-10, Oaza Kawashima, Iizuka-shi Fukuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Katsuhide 1-16-16, Tsujido Higashikaigan Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Haga, Takahide 560-18, Karasawa Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122022.7 | 10.10.2000 | [2001/25] | Priority number, date | JP19990353694 | 13.12.1999 Original published format: JP 35369499 | [2001/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109305 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1109305 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H02N15/00 | [2001/25] | CPC: |
F16C32/0448 (EP,US);
B60L13/10 (KR);
F16C32/0451 (EP,US);
H02N15/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/33] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Regelung eines Magnetschwebesystems | [2001/25] | English: | Magnetic levitation control apparatus | [2001/25] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'un système de lévitation magnétique | [2001/25] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/26] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5565722 (RUBNER WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,4,5,3,2 * column 1, lines 3-13,62; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 5-37,49-67 * * column 4, lines 12-23 * * column 3, lines 49-67; figures 1,3 * * column 4, lines 1-20 * * column 5, lines 33-41; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 27-37; figure 1 *; | [X]GB1549324 (PADANA AG) [X] 4 * page 6, column 2, lines 93-117; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5696412 (IANNELLO VICTOR [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 8, lines 7-27; figures 1,3,7 *; | [A]JPH09126236 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11287248 (KOYO SEIKO CO) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |