EP1096045 - Bearing for a spinning rotor in an open-end spinningdevice [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rieter Ingolstadt Spinnereimaschinenbau AG Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [2001/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knabel, Manfred Schwarzdornstrasse 6 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 02 /
Schuller, Edmund Weckenweg 13 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | 03 /
Bock, Erich Rosenstrasse 11 1/2 85139 Wettstetten / DE | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122126.6 | 12.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | DE1999151640 | 26.10.1999 Original published format: DE 19951640 | DE2000114861 | 24.03.2000 Original published format: DE 10014861 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1096045 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1096045 | Date: | 07.01.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D01H4/12 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
F16C33/201 (EP,US);
D01H4/12 (EP,US);
F16C32/0618 (EP,US);
F16C2208/40 (EP);
F16C2340/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, IT, LI [2002/04] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lagerung für einen Offenend-Spinnrotor | [2001/18] | English: | Bearing for a spinning rotor in an open-end spinningdevice | [2001/18] | French: | Palier pour un rotor de filage dans un métier à filer à bout libre | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 03.11.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, DK, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.02.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 26.02.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3808331 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7-22,25,26 * column 3, line 49 - line 68; figure 4; claims 9,10 *; | [A]US5275493 (IDE RUSSELL D [US]) [A] 1,18,23* column 4, line 6 - line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [DXY]DE19705607 (RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREI [DE]) [DX] 23,24 * the whole document * [Y] 1-22,25,26; | [Y]US5845997 (KINNO DAI [JP], et al) [Y] 5,6 * column 3, line 5 - line 26; figures 1-4 * |