EP1199463 - Exhaust gas recirculation valve and method of opening such a valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siebe Automotive (Deutschland) GmbH Ziegelofenweg 46d 67346 Speyer / DE | [2002/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiery Christoph Heddesheimer Str. 19 68549 Ilvesheim / DE | 02 /
Klipfel Bernhard Karl-Schurz-Str. 66 76187 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Steinke Armin Schubertstr. 7 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 04 /
Schliesche Dirk Sandhofer Str. 9 68305 Mannheim / DE | [2002/17] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122228.0 | 17.10.2000 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1199463 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1199463 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1199463 | Date: | 25.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/07 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
F02M26/67 (EP);
F02M26/54 (EP);
F02M26/48 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/17] | Extension states | SI | 10.04.2003 | Title | German: | Abgasrückführventil und Verfahren zum Öffnen eines Abgasrückführventils | [2002/17] | English: | Exhaust gas recirculation valve and method of opening such a valve | [2002/17] | French: | Valve de recirculation de gaz d'échappement et procédé pour ouvrir une telle valve | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 05.09.2002 | New documents discovered [2002/43] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03021198.1 / EP1375892 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.10.2004 | FI | 17.10.2004 | LU | 17.10.2004 | CH | 31.10.2004 | LI | 31.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | DK | 01.11.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2006/12] | CY | 17.10.2004 | |
FI | 17.10.2004 | ||
CH | 31.10.2004 | ||
LI | 31.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
DK | 01.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | CY | 17.10.2004 | |
FI | 17.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | MC | 31.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4646705 (BABITZKA RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] 1,6,8,9 * abstract * * column 3, line 31 - column 5, line 56; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2724976 (SAGEM ALLUMAGE [FR]) [A] 1,6,9 * abstract * * page 5, line 25 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5626165 (SHINOBU HIDEYUKI [JP]) [X] 9 * column 4, line 28 - line 32 * * column 4, line 38 - line 42 * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0930428 (PIERBURG AG [DE]) [X] 9 * column 2, line 21 - line 26 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 1; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1028249 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 6 * abstract ** column 4, line 18 - column 9, line 1; figures 1-7 * |