EP1096378 - Parallel computer having a hierarchy structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2005 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Yukio c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Yasukawa, Hideki c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 03 /
Kunimatsu, Atsushi c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122268.6 | 19.10.2000 | [2001/18] | Priority number, date | JP19990297439 | 19.10.1999 Original published format: JP 29743999 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1096378 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/18] | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/50, G06F15/80 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G06F9/5066 (EP,US);
G06F13/36 (KR);
G06F15/8007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Paralleler Rechner mit hierarchischer Sruktur | [2001/18] | English: | Parallel computer having a hierarchy structure | [2001/18] | French: | Calculateur parallèle avec structure hiérarchique | [2001/18] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 17.11.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |