EP1180388 - Packaged air filter part and method of packaging the air filter part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2006/05] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meiji, Kazuhiro, c/o Yodogawa Works Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 02 /
Hirano, Seiichi, c/o Yodogawa Works Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 03 /
Inoue, Osamu, c/o Yodogawa Works Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | 04 /
Ohno, Shinji, c/o Yodogawa Works Daikin Industries, Ltd., 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi, Osaka 566-8585 / JP | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122338.7 | 23.10.2000 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | JP20000245872 | 14.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000245872 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180388 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180388 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/08, B01D39/16 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
B01D39/1623 (EP,US);
B01D39/16 (KR);
B01D39/1692 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/065 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0654 (EP,US);
B01D2239/0668 (EP,US);
B01D2239/069 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1233 (EP,US);
B01D2239/1291 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [2002/45] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpacktes Gasfiterteil und Verpackungsverfahren | [2002/08] | English: | Packaged air filter part and method of packaging the air filter part | [2002/08] | French: | Partie de filtre à gaz emballée et méthode d' emballage | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 19.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/50] |
Former [2007/35] | IT | 01.02.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0808648 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0917902 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) | Examination | US6027553 |