EP1090697 - Element, in particular supporting element for frameworks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ebbinghaus, Alfred Schellingstrasse 78 73431 Aalen / DE | [2001/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/15] | Representative(s) | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia Neidl-Stippler Patentanwaltskanzlei Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/15] | Neidl-Stippler, Cornelia, Dr. Rauchstrasse 2 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00122343.7 | 03.09.1996 | [2001/15] | Priority number, date | DE1995214164U | 04.09.1995 Original published format: DE 29514164 U | [2001/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1090697 | Date: | 11.04.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1090697 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | [2009/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/04 | [2001/15] | CPC: |
B62D29/002 (EP);
B21C37/04 (EP);
B21C37/045 (EP);
B22F3/1125 (EP);
B22F7/006 (EP);
B62K19/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/15] | Title | German: | Bauteil, insbesondere tragendes Teil für Fachwerke | [2001/15] | English: | Element, in particular supporting element for frameworks | [2001/15] | French: | Elément, en particulier élément de support pour treillis | [2001/15] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96937180.6 / EP0850113 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR615147 (MELLER) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 12 - line 22 * * page 2, line 7 - line 29 * * page 2, line 60 - line 82; figure -; claims 1,5 *; | [X]US3087807 (ALLEN BENJAMIN C, et al) [X] 1,2,4-6* column 4, line 44 - line 62; figure - * |