Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] |
27.03.2003 | Change - extension states | |
15.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
03.12.2002 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
29.11.2002 | Definitive list of designations | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
27.11.2002 | Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) | |
27.11.2002 | Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) | |
08.03.2002 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2002 [2002/17] |